NY A06798 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - print number 6798a
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - print number 6798a
Pending: Assembly Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the board of standards and appeals in the city of New York to mail a copy of each application for a variance to property owners within 1 mile of the affected property.
Title
Directs the board of standards and appeals in the city of New York to mail a copy of each application for a variance to property owners within 1 mile of the affected property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | Assembly | print number 6798a |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2017-03-17 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S03536 (Same As) 2018-02-09 - PRINT NUMBER 3536A