NY A06788 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits class A multiple dwellings from requiring the use of a smart access system for means of entry for building entrances, common areas, elevators, garage gates, or apartment entry doors; restricts information that may be gathered on lessees, tenants, owners or guests.
Title
Prohibits class A multiple dwellings from requiring the use of a smart access system for means of entry for building entrances, common areas, elevators, garage gates, or apartment entry doors; restricts information that may be gathered on lessees, tenants, owners or guests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | print number 6788b |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | print number 6788a |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S05125 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY