NY A06780 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - SIGNED CHAP.255
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - SIGNED CHAP.255
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Curt McDermott, a part-time town of Shawangunk police officer in the county of Ulster, to take the civil service examination for full-time police officer, and to be placed on the eligible list for appointment if his score on the examination is high enough.
Title
Authorizes Curt McDermott, a part-time town of Shawangunk police officer in the county of Ulster, to take the civil service examination for full-time police officer, and to be placed on the eligible list for appointment if his score on the examination is high enough.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.255 |
2019-09-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.595 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a6780a |
2019-06-05 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.922 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4719A |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-03-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s4719a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.595 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.595 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | print number 6780a |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04719 (Same As) 2019-09-12 - SIGNED CHAP.255