NY A06780 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-1)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5972
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5972
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting pregnant individuals to enroll in the state health insurance exchange at any time.
Title
Relates to permitting pregnant individuals to enroll in the state health insurance exchange at any time.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5972 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.500 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.500 |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-14 | Assembly | print number 6780b |
2015-06-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | print number 6780a |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2015-04-02 | Assembly | referred to insurance |