NY A06777 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes caps on automated enforcement cameras for bus lanes and traffic lights in the city of New York, increases penalties and creates a graduated schedule of fines for repeat offenders, and directs that fines be deposited in the general transportation account of the New York city transportation assistance fund; extends the effectiveness of part II of chapter 59 of the laws of 2010 amending the vehicle and traffic law and the public officers law relating to establishing a bus rapid transit demonstration program to restrict the use of bus lanes by means of bus lane photo devices.
Title
Removes caps on automated enforcement cameras for bus lanes and traffic lights in the city of New York, increases penalties and creates a graduated schedule of fines for repeat offenders, and directs that fines be deposited in the general transportation account of the New York city transportation assistance fund; extends the effectiveness of part II of chapter 59 of the laws of 2010 amending the vehicle and traffic law and the public officers law relating to establishing a bus rapid transit demonstration program to restrict the use of bus lanes by means of bus lane photo devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | print number 6777b |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | print number 6777a |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S01925 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN