NY A06763 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - print number 6763b
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - print number 6763b
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to construct and maintain broadband and related telecommunications infrastructure, or to contract with a corporation or nonprofit organization for such services; authorizes municipalities to issue and sell bonds or other municipal obligations to provide funds for such services.
Title
Authorizes municipalities to construct and maintain broadband and related telecommunications infrastructure, or to contract with a corporation or nonprofit organization for such services; authorizes municipalities to issue and sell bonds or other municipal obligations to provide funds for such services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Assembly | print number 6763b |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | print number 6763a |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S00594 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES