NY A06762 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-08 - substituted by s7196
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the dangers to the safety and health of the public caused by the sale, manufacturing, importing and marketing of firearms and whether such activity constitutes a public nuisance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the dangers to the safety and health of the public caused by the sale, manufacturing, importing and marketing of firearms and whether such activity constitutes a public nuisance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08Assemblysubstituted by s7196
2021-06-08Assemblyrules report cal.591
2021-06-08Assemblyreported
2021-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2021-06-05Assemblyprint number 6762b
2021-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2021-06-05Assemblyreference changed to codes
2021-04-15Assemblyprint number 6762a
2021-04-15Assemblyamend and recommit to economic development
2021-03-29Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S01048 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
S07196 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - SIGNED CHAP.237

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2021/A6762
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06762&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06762
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06762&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06762A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06762&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06762B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06762&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06762&term=2021&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback