NY A06757 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - print number 6757a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - print number 6757a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for corporate franchise tax and personal income gifts for the Helping Our Military in Emergencies (HOME) fund to help families encountering financial emergencies while their loved ones are serving in a combat zone; establishes such fund.
Title
Provides for corporate franchise tax and personal income gifts for the Helping Our Military in Emergencies (HOME) fund to help families encountering financial emergencies while their loved ones are serving in a combat zone; establishes such fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | Assembly | print number 6757a |
2018-02-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-03-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04269 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - PRINT NUMBER 4269A