NY A06756 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - held for consideration in local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - held for consideration in local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the electronic open auction public bond sale pilot program for counties, cities, towns, villages and school districts; such provisions shall remain in effect for 3 years.
Title
Establishes the electronic open auction public bond sale pilot program for counties, cities, towns, villages and school districts; such provisions shall remain in effect for 3 years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Assembly | held for consideration in local governments |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07577 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT