NY A06752 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.206
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to install Lyme and tick-borne disease warning signs at all state-managed parks including trail entryways and campgrounds, as deemed necessary based on an assessment by the office, due to the increased presence of such diseases within the state.
Title
Requires the office of parks, recreation and historic preservation to install Lyme and tick-borne disease warning signs at all state-managed parks including trail entryways and campgrounds, as deemed necessary based on an assessment by the office, due to the increased presence of such diseases within the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.206 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-08 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.267 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | substituted for a6752 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.256 |
2019-03-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | substituted by s4355 |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.267 |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S04355 (Same As) 2019-08-29 - SIGNED CHAP.206