NY A06745 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the public pension of a state employee.
Title
Relates to the public pension of a state employee.
Sponsors
Sen. Jacob Ashby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |