NY A06745 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - print number 6745a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-12 - print number 6745a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "school buildings carbon monoxide detectors act"; requires the installation of carbon monoxide detectors in elementary and secondary school buildings; authorizes the commissioner of education to annually prescribe a special cost allowance for such carbon monoxide detectors.
Title
Enacts the "school buildings carbon monoxide detectors act"; requires the installation of carbon monoxide detectors in elementary and secondary school buildings; authorizes the commissioner of education to annually prescribe a special cost allowance for such carbon monoxide detectors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | Assembly | print number 6745a |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to education |
2015-04-01 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S01618 (Same As) 2016-02-11 - PRINT NUMBER 1618A