NY A06744 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - held for consideration in judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes term limits for the offices of governor, attorney-general and comptroller; limits the amount of time any person can act as governor; limits terms of office of members of the legislature.
Title
Establishes term limits for the offices of governor, attorney-general and comptroller; limits the amount of time any person can act as governor; limits terms of office of members of the legislature.
Sponsors
Asm. Michael Lawler [R] | Asm. Michael Durso [R] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] | Asm. Brian Manktelow [R] |
Asm. John Salka [R] | Asm. Joseph Angelino [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in judiciary |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |