NY A06731 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - signed chap.694
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for accidental disability retirement for deputy sheriffs in Suffolk county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for accidental disability retirement for deputy sheriffs in Suffolk county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-08Assemblysigned chap.694
2023-11-29Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-09SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-09SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2023-06-09Senate3RD READING CAL.1815
2023-06-09SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6598
2023-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-05Assemblyhome rule request
2023-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.536
2023-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.536
2023-06-05Assemblyreported
2023-06-01Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-05-08Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S06598 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6731

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6731
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06731&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06731
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06731&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06731&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06731&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06731&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6731#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback