NY A06728 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - substituted by s6432a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Torah Ohr Hebrew Academy for a portion of the 2021-2022 school taxes, a portion of the 2021 general taxes and all of the 2022 general taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Torah Ohr Hebrew Academy for a portion of the 2021-2022 school taxes, a portion of the 2021 general taxes and all of the 2022 general taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-05Assemblysubstituted by s6432a
2023-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.535
2023-06-05Assemblyreported
2023-06-01Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-05-08Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S06432 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.449

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback