NY A06727 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.511
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.511
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to physical therapist assistants; establishes that physical therapist assistants shall be licensed.
Title
Relates to physical therapist assistants; establishes that physical therapist assistants shall be licensed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Assembly | signed chap.511 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.886 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8746 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.191 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.191 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | print number 6727a |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2021-03-29 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S08746 (Same As) 2022-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6727A