NY A06725 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts persons holding the office of assistant district attorney in the county of Greene from the requirement that such persons reside in such county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts persons holding the office of assistant district attorney in the county of Greene from the requirement that such persons reside in such county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-15Assemblysigned chap.405
2023-09-07Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-08Senate3RD READING CAL.1774
2023-06-08SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7218
2023-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.534
2023-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.534
2023-06-05Assemblyreported
2023-05-31Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-08Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S07218 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6725

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback