NY A06724 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-15 - signed chap.404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the city of Rochester to convey by appropriate instruments to the Rochester Pure Waters District, an easement in Genesee Valley Park, for installation and maintenance of sanitary sewer facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the city of Rochester to convey by appropriate instruments to the Rochester Pure Waters District, an easement in Genesee Valley Park, for installation and maintenance of sanitary sewer facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-15Assemblysigned chap.404
2023-09-07Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-08SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2023-06-08Senate3RD READING CAL.1220
2023-06-08SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6610A
2023-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-05Assemblyhome rule request
2023-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.533
2023-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.533
2023-06-05Assemblyreported
2023-06-01Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-05-08Assemblyreferred to cities

Same As/Similar To

S06610 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6724

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6724
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06724&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06724
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06724&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06724&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06724&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06724&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6724#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback