NY A06718 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - print number 6718a
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - print number 6718a
Pending: Assembly Alcoholism and Drug Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a recovery living task force to establish best practice guidelines for recovery living residences that illustrate the most appropriate and effective environment for persons recovering from a chemical dependency.
Title
Creates a recovery living task force to establish best practice guidelines for recovery living residences that illustrate the most appropriate and effective environment for persons recovering from a chemical dependency.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Sen. Anthony Palumbo [R] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. John Mikulin [R] |
Asm. Steven Englebright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | print number 6718a |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S04496 (Same As) 2020-02-04 - referred to alcoholism and drug abuse