NY A06718 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-16 - signed chap.436
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-09-16 - signed chap.436
Summary
This legislation will remove excess barriers to dental residencies and permit dental residents to take the mandated dental ethics training course during the period of their resi- dency
Title
Allows dental residents to satisfy the ethics and jurisprudence educational course requirement during the period of their dental residency and limits permits in dentistry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-09-16 | signed chap.436 | |
2009-09-04 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.632 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4135A | |
2009-05-26 | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION | |
2009-05-26 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-26 | passed assembly | |
2009-05-21 | advanced to third reading cal.623 | |
2009-05-19 | reported | |
2009-05-11 | print number 6718b | |
2009-05-11 | amend and recommit to higher education | |
2009-03-27 | print number 6718a | |
2009-03-27 | amend and recommit to higher education | |
2009-03-11 | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04135 (Same As) 2009-09-16 - signed chap.436
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06718&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |