NY A06707 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - signed chap.308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-23 - signed chap.308
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of North Collins as the "Tec. 5 Edward Enser Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of North Collins as the "Tec. 5 Edward Enser Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-23 | Assembly | signed chap.308 |
2021-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1786 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6550A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.670 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.670 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | print number 6707a |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S06550 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6707A