NY A06700 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s6357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-09 - substituted by s6357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes procedures regarding orders of post-termination visitation and/or contact between a child and such child's parent and for modification of such orders.
Title
Establishes procedures regarding orders of post-termination visitation and/or contact between a child and such child's parent and for modification of such orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s6357 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.217 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.217 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06357 (Same As) 2021-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.84