NY A06694 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - amended on third reading 6694b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that ownership of unidentifiable part in identifiable motorcycle, other than a stolen motorcycle shall be returned to such owner, provided that department has made findings such owner had no knowledge part was unidentifiable and that owner wasn't responsible nor acted in concert to render such part unidentifiable; provides that a department investigation shall take place within thirty days after seizure of motorcycle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that ownership of unidentifiable part in identifiable motorcycle, other than a stolen motorcycle shall be returned to such owner, provided that department has made findings such owner had no knowledge part was unidentifiable and that owner wasn't responsible nor acted in concert to render such part unidentifiable; provides that a department investigation shall take place within thirty days after seizure of motorcycle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-25Assemblyamended on third reading 6694b
2012-04-25Assemblyvote reconsidered - restored to third reading
2012-04-25AssemblyRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-04-25Senaterecalled from senate
2012-02-07SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2012-02-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-02-07Assemblypassed assembly
2012-01-04Assemblyordered to third reading cal.219
2012-01-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-01-04SenateDIED IN SENATE
2011-06-16SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2011-06-16Assemblydelivered to senate
2011-06-16Assemblypassed assembly
2011-06-16Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.371
2011-06-16Assemblyrules report cal.371
2011-06-16Assemblyreported
2011-06-16Assemblyreported referred to rules
2011-06-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2011-05-17Assemblyreported referred to codes
2011-05-12Assemblyprint number 6694a
2011-05-12Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2011-03-24Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S04280 (Same As) 2012-04-19 - PRINT NUMBER 4280B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback