NY A06694 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-28 - substituted by s2813c

Summary

Establishes the North Country power authority and provides for its powers and duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the North Country power authority and provides for its powers and duties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-28 substituted by s2813c
2010-06-25 ordered to third reading rules cal.382
2010-06-25 rules report cal.382
2010-06-25 reported
2010-06-25 reported referred to rules
2010-06-24 print number 6694d
2010-06-24 amend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2010-04-19 reported referred to ways and means
2010-02-01 print number 6694c
2010-02-01 amend and recommit to codes
2010-01-26 reported referred to codes
2010-01-06 referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2009-06-17 reported referred to ways and means
2009-06-09 reported referred to codes
2009-06-05 print number 6694b
2009-06-05 amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2009-03-19 print number 6694a
2009-03-19 amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2009-03-11 referred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S2813-B (Same As) 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.533

New York State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback