NY A06690 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a commission to be known as the "New York State Temporary Commission on the Threat of Rising Oceans".
Title
Establishes a commission to be known as the "New York State Temporary Commission on the Threat of Rising Oceans".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | print number 6690a |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03428 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO FINANCE