NY A06685 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a committee to study the housing aspect of tourism in the state of New York.
Title
Establishes a committee to study the housing aspect of tourism in the state of New York.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | print number 6685a |
2011-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2011-04-05 | Assembly | reference changed to housing |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S04320 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT