NY A06684 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-12)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - advanced to third reading cal.671
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - advanced to third reading cal.671
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits insurers, providing collision or comprehensive coverage of motor vehicles, from requiring repair shops to use specific vendors or processes for acquisition of vehicle repair parts and materials.
Title
Prohibits insurers, providing collision or comprehensive coverage of motor vehicles, from requiring repair shops to use specific vendors or processes for acquisition of vehicle repair parts and materials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.671 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.135 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.135 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-03-30 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01207 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE