NY A06679 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-10)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-27 - print number 6679b
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the public service commission to review broadband and fiber optic services within the state and requires the expansion of broadband and fiber optic services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the public service commission to review broadband and fiber optic services within the state and requires the expansion of broadband and fiber optic services.

Sponsors

Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Patrick Burke [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]Asm. Doug Smith [R]
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]
Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]
Asm. Andrew Raia [R]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]
Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Steven Otis [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]
Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Karen McMahon [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Deborah Glick [D]
Asm. Brian Barnwell [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. David DiPietro [R]Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]
Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Brian Miller [R]Asm. Michael Norris [R]Asm. Latoya Joyner [D]
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]
Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Angelo Morinello [R]Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]
Asm. Catherine Nolan [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27Assemblyprint number 6679b
2020-02-27Assemblyamend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-05-15Assemblyprint number 6679a
2019-05-15Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2019-03-15Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S01068 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
S05696 (Same As) 2020-03-18 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback