NY A06677 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to general hospital and safety net hospital reimbursement rates and Medicaid adjustments.
Title
Relates to general hospital and safety net hospital reimbursement rates and Medicaid adjustments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | print number 6677b |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | print number 6677a |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-03-15 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05546 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - PRINT NUMBER 5546A