NY A06664 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-26 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that no person shall be denied equal rights under the laws of this state or any subdivision thereof based on that person's sexual orientation or actual or perceived gender identity, appearance, behavior, expression, or other gender-related characteristic regardless of the sex assigned to that person at birth, including, but not limited to, the status of being transgender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that no person shall be denied equal rights under the laws of this state or any subdivision thereof based on that person's sexual orientation or actual or perceived gender identity, appearance, behavior, expression, or other gender-related characteristic regardless of the sex assigned to that person at birth, including, but not limited to, the status of being transgender.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-26Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2024-01-08Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2023-05-15Assemblyopinion referred to judiciary
2023-04-27Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2023-04-26Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback