NY A06663 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s6512
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the maximum amount certain members of the New York state teachers' retirement system may borrow against retirement contributions and makes technical corrections related thereto.
Title
Relates to the maximum amount certain members of the New York state teachers' retirement system may borrow against retirement contributions and makes technical corrections related thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s6512 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.457 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-03-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06512 (Same As) 2021-08-02 - SIGNED CHAP.370