NY A06651 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-09 - substituted by s6097
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to additional member contributions for certain members under the age fifty-seven retirement program; provides that members holding certain titles who due to their age at the time of enrollment in the age fifty-seven retirement program will not obtain twenty-five years of service credit and therefore will not be eligible for a refund of their additional member contributions shall not be required to make additional member contributions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to additional member contributions for certain members under the age fifty-seven retirement program; provides that members holding certain titles who due to their age at the time of enrollment in the age fifty-seven retirement program will not obtain twenty-five years of service credit and therefore will not be eligible for a refund of their additional member contributions shall not be required to make additional member contributions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-09Assemblysubstituted by s6097
2023-06-09Assemblyrules report cal.792
2023-06-09Assemblyreported
2023-06-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-04-25Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S06097 (Same As) 2023-12-08 - SIGNED CHAP.708

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback