NY A06644 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - print number 6644b
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-30 - print number 6644b
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for distinctive plates to be issued for members of the New York city fire riders motorcycle club.
Title
Allows for distinctive plates to be issued for members of the New York city fire riders motorcycle club.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Assembly | print number 6644b |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | print number 6644a |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2017-03-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S02636 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - referred to transportation