NY A06626 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - approval memo.38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-28 - approval memo.38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes service animals or therapy dogs to accompany victims of domestic violence at residential programs for victims of domestic violence.
Title
Authorizes service animals or therapy dogs to accompany victims of domestic violence at residential programs for victims of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-28 | Senate | approval memo.38 |
2015-12-28 | Senate | signed chap.584 |
2015-12-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5372 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.133 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.133 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S05372 (Same As) 2015-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6626