NY A06618 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the New York city tax reform study commission to provide the governor and legislature with a blueprint of reforms to the real property taxation system in the city of New York.
Title
Establishes the New York city tax reform study commission to provide the governor and legislature with a blueprint of reforms to the real property taxation system in the city of New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | print number 6618b |
2017-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | print number 6618a |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2017-03-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S01379 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - referred to real property taxation