NY A06618 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.361
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain institutions to receive state aid for earned associate degrees even after being authorized to confer earned bachelor's degrees during the period from April 1, 2009 to May 1, 2009.
Title
Authorizes certain institutions to receive state aid for earned associate degrees even after being authorized to confer earned bachelor's degrees during the period from April 1, 2009 to May 1, 2009.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.361 |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1283 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1146 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-02-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.314 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.334 |
2013-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-12 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S01146 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6618