NY A06615 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain certification required for eligibility for the real property tax exemption for persons with disabilities and limited incomes.
Title
Relates to certain certification required for eligibility for the real property tax exemption for persons with disabilities and limited incomes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | print number 6615a |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04752 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES