NY A06611 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4836a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s4836a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Nassau county as the "Police Officer Arthur Lopez Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in Nassau county as the "Police Officer Arthur Lopez Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4836a |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.655 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | print number 6611a |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to transportation |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04836 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.102