NY A06609 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - held for consideration in real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the limit upon real property tax levies by local governments; exempts real property owned by a city, town or village from taxes for infrastructure, road maintenance, snow removal, capital projects, consent order and smart growth initiative expenses and any extraordinary expenses required to respond to public health emergencies and pandemics.
Title
Relates to the limit upon real property tax levies by local governments; exempts real property owned by a city, town or village from taxes for infrastructure, road maintenance, snow removal, capital projects, consent order and smart growth initiative expenses and any extraordinary expenses required to respond to public health emergencies and pandemics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Assembly | held for consideration in real property taxation |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | print number 6609a |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2015-03-27 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |