NY A06601 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-9)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - substituted by s4802
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the commissioner of agriculture and markets to identify and develop standards for therapy dogs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the commissioner of agriculture and markets to identify and develop standards for therapy dogs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s4802
2019-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.278
2019-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.278
2019-06-14Assemblyreported
2019-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-03-19Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-03-14Assemblyreferred to agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S04802 (Same As) 2019-06-18 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback