NY A06600 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - substituted by s5098
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of environmental conservation to designate certain species as vulnerable species and prohibits the sale of articles made from any part of a vulnerable species; and requires the department to designate the giraffe as a vulnerable species.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the department of environmental conservation to designate certain species as vulnerable species and prohibits the sale of articles made from any part of a vulnerable species; and requires the department to designate the giraffe as a vulnerable species.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30Assemblysubstituted by s5098
2019-04-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.209
2019-04-09Assemblyreported
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-04-09Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-03-13Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S05098 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback