NY A06594 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of education to establish a regional secondary school advisory council and for such council to make recommendations regarding the establishment of regional high schools; provides for the repeal thereof.
Title
Directs the commissioner of education to establish a regional secondary school advisory council and for such council to make recommendations regarding the establishment of regional high schools; provides for the repeal thereof.
Sponsors
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R] |
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.239 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.373 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.373 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | referred to education |