NY A06580 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - substituted by s6406
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends authorization of the county of Herkimer to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property to 12/01/2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends authorization of the county of Herkimer to impose a county recording tax on obligation secured by a mortgage on real property to 12/01/2025.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-07Assemblysubstituted by s6406
2023-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.645
2023-06-07Assemblyreported
2023-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-04-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S06406 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - SIGNED CHAP.332

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback