NY A06565 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - signed chap.297
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the open auction bond sale pilot program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the open auction bond sale pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-08-23Assemblysigned chap.297
2023-08-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-05Senate3RD READING CAL.1380
2023-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6102
2023-05-22SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2023-05-22Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-05-22Assemblypassed assembly
2023-05-22Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.203
2023-05-22Assemblyrules report cal.203
2023-05-22Assemblyreported
2023-05-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-16Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-04-19Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S06102 (Same As) 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6565

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6565
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06565&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06565
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06565&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06565&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06565&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06565&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6565#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback