NY A06564 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits any child who is at least fourteen years of age to have administered to himself or herself, regardless of parental consent, certain immunizations required or recommended by law.
Title
Permits any child who is at least fourteen years of age to have administered to himself or herself, regardless of parental consent, certain immunizations required or recommended by law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-11-15 | Assembly | print number 6564c |
2019-11-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | print number 6564b |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | print number 6564a |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04244 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HEALTH