NY A06558 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6617b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - substituted by s6617b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to future climate risk and/or sea level rise projections and other weather-related data.
Title
Relates to future climate risk and/or sea level rise projections and other weather-related data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6617b |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6558b |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2014-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | amended on third reading 6558a |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.306 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-04-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-04-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.174 |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |