NY A06557 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-08 - approval memo.42
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Maritime Administration, a component of the United States Department of Transportation with respect to the 2020-2021 and 2021-2022 assessment rolls for the parcel conveyed to such organization located at 307 Steamboat Road, Great Neck, county of Nassau.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the Maritime Administration, a component of the United States Department of Transportation with respect to the 2020-2021 and 2021-2022 assessment rolls for the parcel conveyed to such organization located at 307 Steamboat Road, Great Neck, county of Nassau.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-08Assemblyapproval memo.42
2023-12-08Assemblysigned chap.692
2023-11-29Assemblydelivered to governor
2023-06-09SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-09Senate3RD READING CAL.1813
2023-06-09SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6309A
2023-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2023-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2023-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-05Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.526
2023-06-05Assemblyrules report cal.526
2023-06-05Assemblyreported
2023-06-05Assemblyreported referred to rules
2023-05-26Assemblyprint number 6557a
2023-05-26Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2023-05-16Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2023-04-18Assemblyreferred to real property taxation

Same As/Similar To

S06309 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6557A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6557
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06557&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06557
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06557&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06557A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06557&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06557&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06557&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06557&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A6557#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback