NY A06555 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - print number 6555c
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-09 - print number 6555c
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the Senior Anti-Violence and Enforcement Act (SAVE); establishes a central registry for access to reports of maltreatment of seniors; creates a council on elder abuse; establishes penal provisions regarding offenses against the elderly and disabled.
Title
Enacts the Senior Anti-Violence and Enforcement Act (SAVE); establishes a central registry for access to reports of maltreatment of seniors; creates a council on elder abuse; establishes penal provisions regarding offenses against the elderly and disabled.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Assembly | print number 6555c |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to aging |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | print number 6555b |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | print number 6555a |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S00239 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - PRINT NUMBER 239C