NY A06549 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the commissioner of health from imposing predetermined limits on services under the early intervention program.
Title
Prohibits the commissioner of health from imposing predetermined limits on services under the early intervention program.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Gina Sillitti [D] | Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Kenneth Burgos [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | print number 6549a |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2021-03-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05485 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO DISABILITIES