NY A06549 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - print number 6549a
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - print number 6549a
Pending: Assembly Children and Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of children and family services to work with service providers to gather information to create and maintain a publicly searchable database of available beds at residential facilities currently available for runaway and/or homeless youth.
Title
Requires the office of children and family services to work with service providers to gather information to create and maintain a publicly searchable database of available beds at residential facilities currently available for runaway and/or homeless youth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Assembly | print number 6549a |
2020-02-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to children and families |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S07737 (Same As) 2020-02-12 - REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES